Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company Inc v. Entergy Arkansas Inc

Plaintiff: Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company Inc
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc
Case Number: 1:2010cv00008
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT amending 126 Judgment. Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company, Inc., shall have Judgment against Entergy Arkansas, Inc., for $541,818.07 with interest to accrue at.18% per annum from today until paid in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 09/27/2013. (rhm)
November 6, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company Inc against Entergy Arkansas Inc in the amount of $268,233.29 re 125 Order. This judgment shall accrue interest at.18% per annum from today until paid in full. MNA is entitled to costs, prejudgment interest, attorney's fees, and the specific amount of taxable costs incurred in this lawsuit are deferred pending discussion between the parties and a motion from MNA by 10/20/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/12. (kpr)
December 1, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling in part and sustaining in part Entergy's first [document 66 at 3] Objection to MNA's deposition designations of Todd Bradberry; and overruling Entergy's remaining objections to those designations (document 66 at 4-5). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/1/11. (kpr)
September 29, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company Inc v. Entergy Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri & Northern Arkansas Railroad Company Inc
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?