Daigle v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Troy J Daigle
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00011
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 30 Order entered March 11, 2011, dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/30/11. (kpr) Modified on 3/30/2011 to correct date of Order. (kpr).
March 11, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 plaintiff's Motion to Remand and granting deft Hartford's cross-motion for judgment on the ERISA administrative record. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/11. (kpr)
May 6, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Protective Order; denying 10 Motion to Set Aside Order and motion to compel discovery (12). Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daigle v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy J Daigle
Represented By: Michelle Cushman Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?