Fitzgerald v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel L Fitzgerald
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Hurst, Page and Bagwell
Case Number: 1:2010cv00039
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 106 Memorandum and Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/28/11. (kpr)
August 30, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure pltf's attendance, along with his medical records and institutional file, at the hearing scheduled on 9/22/11 in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/30/11. (vjt)
April 19, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 66 Order granting plaintiff's voluntary motion to dismiss and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/19/11. (kpr)
November 30, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to the 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by deft Nance within 10 days of the date of this ORder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/30/10. (bkp)
November 22, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Magistrate Judge Kearney's proposed findings and recommended disposition, with some clarifications. As to Defendants Hobbs, Hurst, Bagwell, Cantrell, Darland, Noell, Welcher, and Rizor, Fitzgerald's complaint and addenda are not clear, but to the extent he alleges that anyone of these Defendants was involved in the grievance-related retaliation claim that the Court previously decided on 20 September 2010, then they are dismissed with prejudice. Otherwise, they are dismissed without prejudice. 28 U.s.C.A. § 1915A(b)(1). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/10. (hph)
October 1, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Warden Page and Dr. Nance and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original complaint (doc. 1), addenda (doc. nos. 9,15) and summons on deft Page in care of the ADC Compliance Division and Dr. Nance in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/10. (bkp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2010: ) # 1 Main Document - Correct) (thd).
June 7, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or an ifp application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff an ifp application, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel L Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bagwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?