Richardson v. Navistar Inc et al

Plaintiff: Alechia Richardson
Defendant: Navistar Inc, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Navistar International Transportation Corporation and International Harvester Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00042
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice pursuant to the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/12. (kpr)
March 2, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER congratulating the parties on their settlement in mediation; suspending the scheduling order and finding as moot 81 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Ralph E. Scott, 77 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Gary L. Lage, Ph.D, 88 MOTION to Exclude filed by Navistar Inc, 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 79 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Werner and Ziejewski, 88 MOTION to Exclude filed by Navistar Inc, 79 ; MOTION to Exclude Test imony of Werner and Ziejewski 81 , MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Ralph E. Scott, 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 77 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Gary L. Lage, Ph.D. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/2/12. (kpr)
February 9, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion to Strike 84 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), 85 Brief in Support, 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Navistar must file a substituted statement by February 17, 2012, which must conform to the conditions set forth in this Order. Richardson's responses to motion for summary judgment, related brief, and substituted statement is extended until February 27, 2012. Navistar may file a 15-page reply by March 6, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/9/12. (kpr)
August 3, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resolving disputed issues in document no. 67 , as set forth herein. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/3/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Navistar Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alechia Richardson
Represented By: J. Todd Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar International Transportation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Harvester Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?