Horton v. Day et al

Plaintiff: Brady Lee Horton
Defendant: Jason Day, Brandy Blair, David Reynolds and Joe Don Whittingham
Case Number: 1:2010cv00061
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Stone
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 76 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/5/11. (kpr)
March 31, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion for Order; granting plaintiff's 70 Motion to Dismiss Party Hudspeth from his Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/31/11. (kpr)
February 28, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion for Order to Subpoena Tapes; denying 59 Motion to Subpoena Witnesses without prejudice; and denying 60 62 Motions to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court within ten days of the date of this Order whether he intends for Todd Hudspetch to remain an deft in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/28/11. (kpr)
January 20, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 52 MOTION to Compel filed by Brady Lee Horton is actually a request for discoverye and should be re-docketed as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/20/11. (bkp)
December 7, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 Notice (Other) directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints on deft Derek Harmon in care of the Searcy County Sheriff's Department, P.O. Box 812, Marshall, AR 72650, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/7/10. (bkp)
December 1, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on deft Brandy Blair without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/1/10. (bkp)
November 22, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and denying in part 13 Magistrate Judge Kearney's proposed findings and recommended disposition; dismissing Horton's claims against Defendants Reynolds and Whittingham without prejudice. Horton has stated a viable retaliation claim against Blair. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/10. (hph)
October 1, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts Jason Day, Dewayne Pierce and Derek Harmon without prepayment of costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Day et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Lee Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Don Whittingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?