Johnson v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Robert Singleton Johnson, Jr
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, John Maples, Josuah Sorrells and Chad Davis
Case Number: 1:2011cv00004
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 02/04/2014. (rhm)
May 31, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Attorney Dale E. Adams to represent Plaintiff for the sole purpose of obtaining service for Defendant Sorrells; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send to Mr. Adams a copy of this order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/31/2013. (srw)
May 21, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt the 30 Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/21/13. (kpr)
June 15, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Josuah Sorrrells; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and 2 Plaintiff's Complaint on the Defendant at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/15/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Singleton Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josuah Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?