Norman v. Roork et al

Plaintiff: Darren Norman
Defendant: Doug Niendick, John Does, Albert Roork, Walter Dillinger and Tom Hanselmen
Case Number: 1:2011cv00017
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff Norman's complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/2014. (jak)
February 28, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Norman's individual-capacity claim against Deputy Hanselman, his individual-capacity claim against Officer Niendick, and his official-capacity claims against Officer Niendick and Chief Roork remain for trial. The claims against John Does 1-4 are dismissed without prejudice. The Court suspends the scheduling order. An amended scheduling order with reset dates for the unexpired pretrial ddls will issue. The Court respectfully asks the parties to consider consenting to trial before Magistrate Judge Deere in order to get this litigation resolved sooner than later. Any consents are due by 3/15/13 Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/13. (kpr)
November 8, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Luther Sutter to bring his computer and cell phone into the courthouse for a deposition on 11/8/12 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/8/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Roork et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Norman
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Bryan R. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Niendick
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Roork
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Dillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hanselmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?