FutureFuel Chemical Company v. Lonza Inc et al

Plaintiff: FutureFuel Chemical Company
Defendant: Lonza Inc and Lonza Group Ltd
Case Number: 1:2011cv00061
Filed: July 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that all documents filed under seal in this case be unsealed. The parties have ten days in which to file objections to the Court's proposed course of action regarding sealed documents. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/13/12. (kpr)
November 22, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 21 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/22/11. (vjt)
August 24, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon pltf's 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of separate deft Lonza Group Ltd, deft Lonza Group Ltd is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/24/11. (vjt)
July 28, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Janeen Olsen Dougherty to Appear pro hac vice for defts in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/28/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FutureFuel Chemical Company v. Lonza Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FutureFuel Chemical Company
Represented By: Gail Ponder Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonza Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Schlumberger
Represented By: Janeen Olsen Dougherty
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonza Group Ltd
Represented By: Janeen Olsen Dougherty
Represented By: Charles L. Schlumberger
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?