Bales et al v. Farguson et al

Plaintiff: Todd Bales, Wilard Hood and Noe Cardoza
Defendant: Sara Brently, Moore, Farguson, Does, Bamcumm and Cody
Case Number: 1:2011cv00070
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff Cardoza's claims against all defendants. Plaintiff Hood and Bale's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/2014. (jak)
December 12, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 113 First MOTION to Dismiss . Mr. Cardoza is directed to file a response within 14 days of this Order. The Clerk is directed to correct the docket to show that Mr. Cardoza is proceeding pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/12/12. (kpr)
April 6, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER correcting 76 previous Order in which the Court terminated Beel, when Brently should have been terminated, not Beel. The Court directs the Clerk to restore Beel and terminate Brently. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/6/12. (kpr)
March 22, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 50 Partial Report and Recommendations; dismissing Bales's claims without prejudice; directing the Clerk to terminate him as a party plaintiff; and, directing the Clerk to terminate as party defendants Ferguson, Branscumb, John Doe "Donnie," Moore, Beel, Lawson, and Cockrill. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/22/2012. (dmn)
February 1, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 39 Partial Report and Recommendations with one clarification: Hood's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bales et al v. Farguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Brently
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bamcumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Bales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilard Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?