Waller v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller, Jr
Defendant: Barbara Ann Gilbert, Wendy Kelley, Billy Cowell, Ashley Bagswell, Jennifer G Horn, Melvin E Nance, Betty Hutchinson, Corizon Medical Service, Brenda S Bridgeman, S Armstrong and Shelia Ann Waldrupe
Case Number: 1:2011cv00095
Filed: November 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 JUDGMENT re 178 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case in favor of the defendants. An ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/3/13. (kpr)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER ADOPTING 165 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Kelley's motion for summary judgment 89 is GRANTED, and pltf's claims against her are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/13. (vjt) (Modified on 7/9/2013 to correct typographical error). (vjt)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying 168 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge; denying 169 Plaintiff's Motion for Prohibition. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/27/2013. (kcs)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER declining to accept 127 proposed findings and recommended partial disposition of magistrate judge. This action is again referred to Magistrate Judge Ray for disposition or recommended disposition, as appropriate, for all pretrial matters, including a reconsideration of Kelleys motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/9/2013. (mcz)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's requests for appointment of counsel and for an extension of the time to complete discovery, both of which are contained in his Motion to Compel, are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/01/2012. (kcs)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/21/2012. (kcs)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 47 ; denying 43 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Kenneth L Waller, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/12. (kpr)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 13 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 11 , and this Order on defts without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/12. (vjt)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER vacating 5 11/04/2011 Recomended Partial Disposition; granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; denying, as moot 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Service. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint 8 as "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint." Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/06/2012. (kcs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ann Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Bagswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer G Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin E Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda S Bridgeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Ann Waldrupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?