Kemp v. Huffman et al

Plaintiff: Marvin L Kemp
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Nathen Huffman, Noels, Joe Page, III, John Maples and Marvin Evans
Case Number: 1:2012cv00001
Filed: January 9, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Huffman's complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/2014. (jak)
June 10, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending 60 Final Scheduling Order and cancelling the trial. The Court will hold a status conference on Thursday, 19 June 2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom B-155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas, 72201. Kemp, his lawyer, and Huffman must attend. Kemp should attempt to locate a current address and telephone number for Huffman and notify the Court with a filing under seal. Kemp must also have Huffman personally served as soon as possible with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/10/2014. (jak)
May 27, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file pretrial disclosure sheets, trial briefs, and jury instructions as soon as possible. The Court directs the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order, and 60 Final Scheduling Order to Nathan Huffman. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/27/2014. (jak)
May 16, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 49 and granting the 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court dismisses all claims against defts Noell, Page, Maples, Evans, and Hobbs; dismisses Kemp's official-capacity claim against Huffman; and allows Kemp to proceed with his individual-capacity claim against Huffman. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/13. (kpr)
January 22, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining 44 Report and Recommendations and referring the case back to Judge Young for further proceedings as necessary. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/22/13. (kpr)
May 4, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Jonathon Noel. The Clerk shall prepare summons for Noel and Huffman, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and complaint, and this order, on them at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/4/12. (kpr)
March 30, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding the 11 MOTION for Reconsideration of the 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS moot and declining to adopt the recommendation of the magistrate judge. Plaintiff has since provided the Court a correct current adress. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/30/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Huffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin L Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathen Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?