Kemp v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Marvin L Kemp
Defendant: Nathen Huffman, Joe Page, III, Ray Hobbs, Marvin Evans, Noels and John Maples
Case Number: 1:2012cv00003
Filed: January 9, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge; granting Defendant's 85 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/5/2014. (mcz)
April 29, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 69 Answer to Amended Complaint. Deft Calvin Carter has supplied his correct name. The Clerk of the Court is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of this deft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/13. (kpr)
February 26, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 56 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; granting 48 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint against these defendants with prejudice; and referring 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney for consideration. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/26/2013. (dmn)
November 28, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to the 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jonathon Noel, Joe Page, III, John Maples, Ray Hobbs, Marvin Evans within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/28/12. (kpr)
August 20, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 45 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/12. (kpr)
July 16, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing party Nathan Huffman from the complaint, without prejudice, for failure to serve. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/16/12. (kpr)
April 11, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Nathan Huffman, and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/11/12. (kpr)
April 4, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to modify the nature of suit code from 555 prison condition civil rights to a 440 other civil rights case; the case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney for appropriate actions. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/4/12. (vjt)
February 23, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 7 Memorandum and Order dismissing complaint without prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/23/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathen Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin L Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?