Peterson v. Faust et al

Plaintiff: Victoria L Peterson
Defendant: N Faust and John Maples
Case Number: 1:2012cv00008
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 25 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/27/12. (kpr)
November 19, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Continue 23 . Defendants must file any dispositive motions on or before 12/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/19/2012. (kcs)
April 10, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf may proceed with her December 2011 retaliation claim against defts Maples and Faust, and all other claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons and complaints 2 9 on defts without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/10/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Faust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria L Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?