Harrell v. Independence County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Genie Harrell
Defendant: Independence County, Arkansas, Independence County Assessor's Office, Odus Fulmer and Greg Potts
Case Number: 1:2012cv00020
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Woodruff
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT for Genie Harrell against Odus Fulmer, individually, for $110,455.01. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.25% per annum from 10 April 2015 (the date of the original Judgment) until this Judgment is paid. All Harrell's other claims against all other parties are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/15/2015. (jak)
October 14, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT: The Court amends its Judgment, 100 . Genie Harrell shall have Judgment against Odus Fulmer, individually, or $110,455.01. This Amended Judgment shall accrue interest at 0.25% per annum from 10 April 2015 (the date of the original Judgment) until paid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/14/2015. (jak)
April 10, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Court enters judgment for Genie Harrell against Odus Fulmer, individually, for $75,001.00, for post-judgment interest as provided by law, and for costs and reasonable attorney's fees as the Court may later allow on timely mo tion. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.25% per annum from today until this Judgment is paid. 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a)-(b). All of Harrell's other claims against all other parties are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (ks)
April 3, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the 3 April 2015 telephone hearing, the Court makes the following evidentiary rulings. Harrell's objections, 67 , are overruled. Harrell's objections, 77 , are overruled without prejudice. Harrell's motion in limine, 72 , is granted. And Defendants' motion in limine, 74 , is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2015. (jak)
March 27, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding defendants and claims that remain in this case for trial. There is a Title VII wrongful-termination claim against Independence County. There is no 1983 claim remaining against the County, but there is a 1983 equal protection claim aga inst Fulmer and Potts individually. Qualified immunity remains possible; and the Court will rule on that defense at the end of the proof or after trial. The Court ruled that there are jury questions on why Harrell was fired, 60 , the 1983 claim against Fulmer and Potts, as individuals, necessarily survives. The draft jury instructions and verdicts will cover all this ground. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/2015. (jak)
March 9, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is first out for trial on 6 April 2015. No updated proposed instructions or pre-trial disclosures have been filed, so the Court assumes the parties are standing on everything filed in January 2014. If not, file any new materials by 13 March 2015. Pretrial will begin at 9:30 a.m. and the venire at 12:30. The parties should be prepared to open and start the proof Monday afternoon. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/9/2015. (jak)
September 30, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 49 Order granting defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. Harrell's official-capacity claims against Fulmer and Potts are dismissed without prejudice. All Harrell's claims against the Independence County Assessor's Office are dismissed without prejudice. All the other claims in her complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/30/13. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 9/30/2013 to correct spacing and typographical errors.) (thd).
July 26, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Strike ; granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court imposes the following condensed briefing schedule for dispositive motions: Motions due by 2 August 2013; Responses due by 16 August 2013; Replies due by 23 August 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/26/13. (kpr)
May 17, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying [] Motion to Amend/Correct. The Independence County Assessor's Office is dismissed as a party. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/12. (kpr)
February 15, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Arkansas, Northern Division. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/15/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Independence County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genie Harrell
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence County, Arkansas
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence County Assessor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odus Fulmer
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Potts
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?