Brown v. Berhndt et al

Plaintiff: David Brown
Defendant: Crown Point Condominium Owner's Association, Paul Berhndt, Crown Pointe Timesharing Inc, Crown Point Council of Co-Owners and Vicki Whited
Case Number: 1:2012cv00024
Filed: February 28, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re the Court's Orders of April 19, 2013 53 and November 14, 2013 59 . David Brown's claims under Title VII of the ADA of 1990 are dismissed with prejudice. The period of limitations on Mr. Brown's state-law claims is tolled under 28 U.S.C. § 1367(d) for 30 days after entry of judgment in this case, unless Arkansas gives a longer tolling period. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/14/13. (kpr)
April 19, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting separate defts' 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Mr. Brown's claims under Title III of the ADA and t he FHA, and those claims are dismissed with prejudice as to separate defts. The Court removes this case f rom the trial docket and directs the parties to brief the issues outlined in this Order. Opening briefs should be filed on or before Friday, May 3, 2013, responses are due ten business days after opening briefs are filed, and replies are due five business days after opening briefs are filed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/19/13. (kpr)
April 10, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 45 Order. The period of limitations on Mr. Brown's state-law claims is tolled for 30 days after entry of this Judgment, unless Arkansas gives a longer tolling period. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/10/13. (kpr)
October 3, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion for Costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/3/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Berhndt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Point Condominium Owner's Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Berhndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Pointe Timesharing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Point Council of Co-Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Whited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?