Bowman v. Tilton et al

Plaintiff: Susan Bowman
Defendant: Robert Tilton, Barbara Tilton and Nautic Global Group Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv00036
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting joint 111 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/6/2014. (ks)
July 8, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating 1:13CV00054 with 1:12CV00036. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 07/08/2013. (plm)
July 23, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 23 MOTION for Extension of Time; pltf has 120 days from the entry date of this Order to conduct discovery before responding to 20 motion for summary judgment filed by separate deft Barbara Tilton. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/23/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bowman
Represented By: J. Bruce McMath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautic Global Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?