Hopson v. Glenn et al

Plaintiff: Dwight C Hopson
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, John Maples, Betty Hutchinson, Preston Glenn and Melvin Nance
Case Number: 1:2012cv00046
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 49 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, granting Defendants' 35 , 38 and 42 Motions for Summary Judgment. Hopson's claims against Hutchinson, Nance, Page and Ramsey are dismissed without prejudice. His claims against Glenn are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2013. (mcz)
October 12, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing Hopson's claims against Kelly, Maples, and Yarbrough, without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/12. (kpr)
June 15, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail the Section 1983 complaint form to Plaintiff; directing Plaintiff, if he wishes to amend his original Complaint, to complete the new complaint form in its entirety, mark it as "Amended Complaint, and file within 30 days of the date of this Order; finding portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, as it now stands, are deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this Order; and finding service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/15/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Glenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight C Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?