BB Buggies Inc v. Bad Boy Inc

Plaintiff: BB Buggies Inc
Defendant: Bad Boy Inc
Counter_claimant: Bad Boy Inc
Counter_defendant: BB Buggies Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv00057
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 motion for protective order; denying 27 motion for second protective order; granting in part and denying in part 33 motion to compel. Bad Boy is to take action consistent with this Order within 21 days from the date of this Order. The parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding discovery within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/10/2014. (mmd)
May 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 Second MOTION for Protective Order filed by BB Buggies Inc, 25 MOTION for Protective Order filed by BB Buggies Inc. These motions relate to a deposition noticed for Tuesday, May 7, 2013. In a telephone conf erence held today, the parties agreed to remove the noticed deposition from the calendar pending this Court's resolution or the parties' resolution of plaintiff's pending motions for protective orders. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/3/13. (kpr)
April 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw 21 MOTION for Discovery For Additional Interrogatories or, Alternatively, Ruling that Interrogatories Do Not Exceed Limit. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/8/13. (kpr)
November 26, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/26/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BB Buggies Inc v. Bad Boy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Bad Boy Inc
Represented By: Trent C. Keisling
Represented By: Meredith Kristin Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: BB Buggies Inc
Represented By: Kathryn Bennett Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BB Buggies Inc
Represented By: Kathryn Bennett Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Inc
Represented By: Meredith Kristin Lowry
Represented By: Trent C. Keisling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?