Rashad v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: Fahim Jamal Rashad
Defendant: Jane Does, John Ferguson, Donald Vaulner and Dobbs
Case Number: 1:2013cv00003
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 137 Order filed on this date, dismissing the case without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/11/2014. (mmd)
January 21, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 78 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying the 73 Motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/21/14. (kpr)
July 19, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 48 Motion for Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/19/13. (vjt)
May 29, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects 30 Partial Report and Recommendations. Any claim not related to plaintiff Fahim Jamal Rashad's failure to receive adequate medical care for the knot in his groin is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/29/2013. (dmn)
April 3, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fahim Jamal Rashad. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/3/13. (kpr)
April 1, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 4 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rashad v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Vaulner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fahim Jamal Rashad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?