Murphy v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Ryan Murphy
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Faust, Linda Dixon and John Maples
Case Number: 1:2013cv00020
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Murphy's complaint is dismissed with prejudice as against Dixon, Evans, Faust, Guy, Hobbs, Jones, Maples, Robins, and Weekly. Murphy's complaint is dismissed without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2014. (jak)
August 28, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 151 Motion to Dismiss. It is time to decide this case on the merits. If Murphy has any objection to the Proposed Findings and Recommendations, 150 , it is due by 8 September 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/28/2014. (jak)
February 14, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 111 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Murphy's 108 Motion to dismiss sixteen defendants granted. Her claims against Dykes, Phipps, Dickinson, Ayers, Dockins, Willis, Aiken, Ming, Allen, Dunavion, Williams, Richardson, Bryant, Chapman, Potter, and Gaza are dismissed without prejudice. The case will go forward against Hobbs, Maples, Faust, Dixon, Guy, Weekly, Robins, Evans, and Jones. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/14/2014. (jak)
January 29, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 74 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 57 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/14. (kpr)
November 14, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 38 Order. Murphy's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/13. (kpr)
May 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as the Court's own opinion 7 Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/15/2013. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ryan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?