Waller v. Maples et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller
Defendant: D P Neldon, Richard Fry and John Maples, Jr
Case Number: 1:2013cv00025
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 50 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/10/2014. (rhm)
June 2, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 42 PARTIAL PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing Danny Neldon as a named defendant. The remaining defendants may file a dispositive motion relating to the retaliation claims within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/02/2014. (rhm)
January 21, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to File a Video Exhibit under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/21/14. (kpr)
August 5, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/5/13. (kpr)
April 16, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a response to the 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth L Waller within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/16/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. Maples et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D P Neldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?