Mason v. Harrison et al

Plaintiff: Uaron Mason
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Edward Harrison and Clinton Baker
Case Number: 1:2013cv00071
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 77 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/15/2014. (jak)
January 29, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 MOTION to Produce filed by Uaron Mason. This motion should be re-docketed as evidence in support of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/29/14. (kpr)
January 16, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Issuance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/16/2014. (rhm)
January 6, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/6/2014. (jak)
October 25, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 MOTION for Copies filed by Uaron Mason. This motion shall be re-docketed as a request for production from defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/25/13. (kpr)
September 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts Harrison and Hobbs are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/17/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Harrison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uaron Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?