McClure v. Weekly

Plaintiff: Sean R McClure
Defendant: Weekly
Case Number: 1:2013cv00086
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 the proposed findings and recommendations; dismissing Plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; dismissal of this action constitutes a "strike" within the meaning of the Pr ison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA), 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); it is further certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/26/2014. (kdr)
January 6, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint within fifteen days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Complaint form. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/2014. (jak)
November 14, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with 6 Order, case dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/14/2013. (rhm)
October 1, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, without prejudice, the 2 application to proceed ifp because the plaintiff has not included the necessary financial information in support. The plaintiff shall submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed ifp appl ication within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send to plaintiff an ifp application and calculation sheet. The Clerk shall also forward copies of this Order to the Warden of the Grimes Unit, 300 Correction Drive, Newport, AR 72112. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure v. Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean R McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?