Simpson v. Cavalry SPV I LLC et al

Plaintiff: Patty E Simpson
Defendant: McHughes Law Firm and Cavalry SPV I LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00093
Filed: October 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Set Aside Judgment and Motion to Dismiss. The 29 judgment entered on September 29, 2014, is hereby set aside. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/2014. (ks)
October 1, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ARKANSAS SUPREME COURT re 22 Certification of Issue to State Court, 25 Per Curiam Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/2014. (ks)
September 29, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68, defendant's offer of judgment, and the plaintiff's notice of acceptance of that offer, judgment is entered in favor of Patty E. Simpson against Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as Assignee of HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A./Orchard Bank in the amount of $10,000.00 plus post judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.12% per annum, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/29/2014. (ks)
January 27, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court PER CURIUM ORDER from the Arkansas Supreme Court granting 22 Request to certify question of law. Petitioner's brief due 20 days from the date of this Per Curium Order. Respondent's brief due 30 days after the filing of Petitioner's brief. Petitioner may file a reply brief within 15 days after Respondent's brief has been filed.(ks) (Docket text modified on 1/27/2014 to correct the description of the document filed; docket entry modified to correct the event.) (thd).
January 8, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying this action pending resolution from the Supreme Court of Arkansas on the 22 Certification Order issued 1/7/2014. All deadlines are suspended. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/8/2014. (ks)
January 7, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION ORDER, pursuant to Rule 6-8 of the Rules of the Supreme Court of the State of Arkansas, this Court certifies to the Supreme Court of Arkansas a question of law that may be determinative of this case. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward this Order to the Supreme Court of Arkansas under his official seal. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/7/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Cavalry SPV I LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHughes Law Firm
Represented By: Christopher Duane Anderson
Represented By: Becky A. McHughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I LLC
Represented By: R. Frank Springfield
Represented By: Zachary D. Miller
Represented By: Becky A. McHughes
Represented By: Megan Perkins Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty E Simpson
Represented By: Harold F. Cook, Jr.
Represented By: James Ralph Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?