Garrett v. Guy et al

Plaintiff: Victoria Diane Garrett
Defendant: Linda Dixon, Faust, Guy, Timothy Goza, Ponchilla Noles, Weekly and Michael Harmon
Case Number: 1:2013cv00110
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 25 Opinion and Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of defendants, and this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/16/2014. (ks)
June 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days of the entry of this Order, a Response to 19 , 20 and 21 as instructed in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/18/2014. (kcs)
June 4, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER direcing the Defendants that if they wish to proceed with their Motion for Summary Judgment 19 , they must file a Statement of Undisputed Material Facts within 7 days of the entry of this Order. If Defendants file a Statement in compliance with Local Rule 56.1, the Court will then enter a separate Order establishing the time within which Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' summary judgment papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/04/2014. (kcs)
March 13, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff may proceed with her due process claims against Guy, Faust, Weekly, and Noles. All other claims and defendants are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Guy, Faust, Weekly, and Noles. The USMS is directed to serve the summons, substituted complaint, and amended substituted complaint on each of them through the ADC Compliance Office without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/13/2014. (ks)
December 2, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/02/2013. (kcs)
November 29, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/29/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Guy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponchilla Noles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Diane Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?