Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Sauseda et al

Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Anna Sauseda, Maria Rodriguez and Jackson Funeral Homes Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv00112
Filed: December 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has received John P. Samarripas's letter requesting the release of the remaining life insurance proceeds held in the Court's registry for him, 31 . The Court directs the Clerk to issue a check payable to John P. Samarripas for the remaining proceeds plus any accrued interest. The check should be FedExed to John P. Samarripas, c/o Maria Rodriguez, 701 S. El Paso Street, Hearne, Texas, 77859-2488, with a delivery signature required from either Samarripas or Rodriguez. The Clerk should file confirmation of delivery on the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/16/2016. (jak)
December 23, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Case is dismissed with prejudice based on the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice all claims against Jackson Funeral Homes and Minnesota Life Insurance Company. The Court directs the Clerk to realign the parties so that Sauseda is the plaintiff and Rodriguez is the defendant. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)
July 14, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Minnesota Life deposited a total of $37,853.13 with the Clerk. The policy proceeds had earned some interest. See the attached letters. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Sauseda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Sauseda
Represented By: Omar F. Greene, II
Represented By: Alicia Walton-Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Funeral Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?