Davis v. Standford et al

Plaintiff: Brent Lavon Davis
Defendant: Ronda Standford, Billy Cowell and Marcus Wilkerson
Case Number: 1:2014cv00046
Filed: May 8, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Davis's claims against Cowell are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Davis's claim against Stanford is dismissed with prejudice. Davis's inadequate-medical-care claim against Wilkerson is dismissed with prejudice. Davis's other claims against Wilkerson are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/18/2015. (jak)
August 17, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed partial recommendations, 79 and 80 with one change. Wilkerson's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 29 , is granted. Davis may proceed with his claim that Wilkerson denied him adequate medical care on 24 September 2013. Davis's other claims against Wilkerson are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Cowell and Stanford's Motion for Summary Judgment, 57 , is granted. Davis's claims against Cowell are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Davis's claim against Stanford is dismissed with prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2015. (jak)
May 12, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion 74 granted. The stay is lifted. Wilkerson's motion, 29 is reinstated. And he may move for summary judgment on any remaining claims within 21 days after the Court resolves the current motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/12/2015. (jak)
February 26, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and 53 Motion for Copy of Deposition, as moot; and denying 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/26/2015. (kcs)
February 25, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 56 Motion to Stay. The stay only applies to Davis's 1983 claims against Wilkerson, and not those Davis has raised against Rhonda Stanford and Billy Cowell. To better manage the Court's docket, Wilkerson's mot ion for partial summary judgment, 29 , is denied without prejudice. It may be reinstated by notice if and when the automatic stay is lifted by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/25/2015. (jak)
January 12, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 44 Recommendation. Motion for judgment on the pleadings, 27 , denied. The Court directs the Clerk to file a copy of 42 as Davis's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2015. (jak)
September 16, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, a Response to 29 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Marcus Wilkerson; Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely do so, his claims against Defendant Wilkerson will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/16/2014. (kcs)
August 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition. Davis's motion for injunctive relief, 8 , is denied as unsupported. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/28/2014. (jak)
May 9, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/09/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Standford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Lavon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Standford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?