Sieber v. Benton et al

Plaintiff: Austin Lee Sieber
Defendant: Jason Benton, Jon Furgeson and Steven Jefferys
Case Number: 1:2014cv00055
Filed: May 21, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 54 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/12/2016. (ljb)
March 23, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITION in its entirety; allowing Mr. Sieber to proceed with his claims against defendant Jason Benton for excessive force and failure to protect; dismissing all other cla ims and defendants without prejudice; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Mr. Benton; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, 5 Substituted Complaint, and this Order on Mr. Benton without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/23/2015. (rhm)
May 22, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/22/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sieber v. Benton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Lee Sieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Furgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jefferys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?