Henry v. Spicer et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Henry
Defendant: Kane Spicer and R Sterling
Case Number: 1:2014cv00071
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Henry's claims against Sterling are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Henry's due process, excessive force, and outrage claims are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Henry's official- capacity claim for money damages against Spicer is dismissed with prejudice based on sovereign immunity. Henry's equal protection claim against Spicer is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/10/2015. (ks)
October 1, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Partial Recommended Disposition. Henry's claims against Sterling are dismissed without prejudice. His due process, excessive force, and outrage claims are dismissing without prejudice. Henry's claim for money damages against Spicer in his official capacity is dismissed with prejudice. All that remains is an equal protection claim against Spicer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/2014. (jak)
June 18, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward an IFP Application along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to return a completed IFP Application or pay the $400.00 filing fee within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/18/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Spicer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?