Morris v. Malvern Diagnostic Center et al

Plaintiff: Mark Morris
Defendant: Malvern Diagnostic Center, Ouachita River Correctional Unit, Does, Kacey Jo Kiker, Weekly and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 1:2014cv00078
Filed: July 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 41 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/2015. (ks)
September 1, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 37 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Aundrea Weekly is dismissed from plaintiff's complaint without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/2015. (ks)
December 9, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommendations in their entirety; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Kiker and Pickering are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/9/2014. (ks)
September 9, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Defendants Malvern Diagnostic Center, Ouachita River Correctional Unit, and Ray Hobbs, are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/9/2014. (ks)
July 30, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Plaintiff to have one final opportunity in which to submit an Amended Complaint in accordance with the directions set forth in this Order and in the 3 July 18, 2014 Order within twenty days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/30/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Malvern Diagnostic Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malvern Diagnostic Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouachita River Correctional Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kacey Jo Kiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?