Halton v. Swain et al

Plaintiff: Christine Halton
Defendant: Richard Swain, Kim Rackley and Vaughn
Case Number: 1:2014cv00118
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Teresa Vaughn, Diane Lackey, Richard Swain, Kim Rackley that complies with the Local Rule and the instructions in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/06/2015. (kcs)
December 10, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff is allowed to PROCEED with her inadequate medical care claims against defendants Richard Swain and Te resa Vaughn. Defendants Kim Rackley and Diane Lackey are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for defendants Richard Swain and Teresa Vaughn and that service be effected by the United States Marshal. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/10/2014. (ks)
September 26, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/26/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halton v. Swain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Halton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?