Obama v. Naracon et al

Plaintiff: Ishmael Hassan Obama
Defendant: Nicholas Naracon and Bradley Howard Robertson
Case Number: 1:2014cv00136
Filed: October 30, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Obama's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/2015. (jak)
September 17, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as supplemented 52 Recommendation; denying 49 Motion for TRO; denying 49 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/17/2015. (ks)
April 10, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court adopts the partial recommendations, 9 & 30 and overrules Obama's objections, 14 & 33 . Obama has not presented any facts showing that his constitutional rights have been violated or that he is in imminent danger of irrep arable harm. Obama's motion for temporary restraining order, 20 , is denied. Obama's motions to amend his complaint, 15 & 22 , are denied. His proposed claims are unrelated to those in his original complaint and are too remote from the events at issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obama v. Naracon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmael Hassan Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Naracon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Howard Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?