Jones v. Ramsey et al

Plaintiff: Justin L Jones
Defendant: Rouse, Vernon Robertson, Christopher Budnik, Raylina Ramsey and McIntyre
Case Number: 1:2014cv00141
Filed: November 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered dismissing this case with prejudice 58 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/23/2016. (lej)
September 16, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall alter the docket to reflect that Defendant 'Rouse' is 'Allen Rouse' and that Defendant 'Christopher Budnik' is 'Christopher Budnic'. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted 38 . Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Rouse, Robertson, Budnic, and Davis are dismissed without prejudice due to his failure to exhaust administrative remedies against them. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/16/2015. (lej)
December 18, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations as regarding the dismissal of Defendant McIntyre. Plaintiff's disciplinary allegations are referred to Judge Volpe for additional consideration. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/18/2014. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ramsey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Budnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raylina Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?