First National Bank of Izard County v. B & H Resources, LLC et al

Plaintiff: First National Bank of Izard County
Defendant: B & H Resources, LLC, Northstar Farms LLC, John P Hardy, Celtic Bank and Helen Bartmess
Cross_claimant: Celtic Bank
Cross_defendant: Northstar Farms LLC, B & H Resources, LLC and Helen Bartmess
Counter_claimant: Celtic Bank
Counter_defendant: First National Bank of Izard County
Case Number: 1:2015cv00005
Filed: January 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE OF FORECLOSURE against Northstar Farms LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/8/2017. (mef)
April 4, 2017 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Because Celtic has not served Elite within the time permitted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), its third-party complaint against Elite is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/4/2017. (mef)
January 19, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Celtic's motion for partial summary judgment in personam against Evergreen; awarding Celtic Bank judgment against Evergreen Processing, LLC in the amount of $4,563,590.72 as of 4/27/2016 plus interest at 6% annum un til paid in full; and judgment in the amount of $115,213.90 as of 4/27/2016 plus interest at 18% per annum until paid in full. The Court maintains jurisdiction over the parties to settle claims related to the real estate and frac sand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/19/2017. (mef)
October 4, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE Against Northstar Farms LLC in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $358,604.93 plus interest accruing daily after 9/27/2016 at the rate of $64.04 per day and for its costs plus an attorney's fee in th e amount of $35,860. If Judgment is not paid within a reasonable time the real property described herein is to be sold at public auction and U.S. Marshal Clifton Massanelli is directed to make the sale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/4/2016. (mef)
June 3, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court WARNING ORDER issued as to James P. Hardy, Jr., individually, and Hardy Energy Services, Inc. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Bank of Izard County v. B & H Resources, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Bank of Izard County
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & H Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Bartmess
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Celtic Bank
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Northstar Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: B & H Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Helen Bartmess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Celtic Bank
Represented By: Robert Joseph Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: First National Bank of Izard County
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?