Bishop v. Jefferies et al

Plaintiff: Richmond Bishop
Defendant: Steven Jefferies, Sissy Wilson, Lynn Croslin and Zack Bailey
Case Number: 1:2015cv00020
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Bishop's failure-to-protect claim is dismissed with prejudice. Bishop's other claims are all dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/21/2016. (jak)
November 30, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send Mr. Bishop a freeworld amended application to proceed IFP. Mr. Bishop must file, within thirty days of the entry of this Order, an Amended Application to Proceed IFP. Mr. Bishop is reminded that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case, will be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/30/2015. (jak)
April 20, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Bishop's vague and conclusory allegations of inadequate medical care are dismissed without prejudice because he has not explained what type of medical care he needs or who failed to provide him with that care. Bishop's access-to-the- courts claim is dismissed without prejudice because he has not suffered an actual injury as a result of being denied access to a law library. Bishop's claim that defendants are not properly responding to his grievances is dismissed without prej udice. Bishop's claims that defendants provided him with dirty matts, interfered with his legal mail, retaliated against him for filing this lawsuit, and otherwise violated his constitutional rights after he commenced this action on 5 February 2015 are dismissed without prejudice. Bishop may proceed on his failure-to-protect claim against Croslin, Bailey, and Wilson in their individual capacities only. All official capacity claims are dismissed without prejudice. Sheriff Jeffries is dismi ssed as a defendant without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Wilson, Croslin, and Bailey. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, second amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2015. (jak)
February 7, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/07/2015. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Jefferies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richmond Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jefferies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sissy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Croslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?