Coe v. White et al

Plaintiff: John David Coe
Defendant: Rick Gillespie
Case Number: 1:2015cv00037
Filed: March 24, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 48 Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/20/2015. (ks)
May 28, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 29 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 20 motion for summary judgment. Defendant Rick Gillespie is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's [2 8] Motion to Object to the Exclusion of Defendant Patrick McCown is DENIED as moot. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/28/2015. (ks)
May 11, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 15 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. The Clerk will send a section 1983 complaint form to Plaintiff. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2015. (ks)
April 21, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 4 pltf's claims against defts David White, Eddy Selvey, and Patrick McCowan are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and they are dismissed as defts; the Court certifies, that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/21/15. (tjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coe v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Gillespie
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?