Johnson v. Richard et al

Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Defendant: Richard, Okai and Gatlain
Case Number: 1:2015cv00056
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendants' 87 Motion to Compel is GRANTED; Defendants' 91 Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/17/2016. (mcz)
December 7, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 75 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety; denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and denying Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief, which this Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/7/2015. (ljb)
May 22, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's retaliation, disciplinary and grievance claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendants Baker, Banister, Faust, Banks, Evans, Naylor, Lawrence and Griffin are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/22/2015. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okai
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatlain
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?