Roberts et al v. Unimin Corporation

Plaintiff: Kathy Roberts and Karen McShane
Defendant: Unimin Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv00071
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 124 Opinion and Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of Unumin Corporation against Kathy Roberts and Karen McShane, jointly and severally, in the amount of $2,225.60 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.82% per annum, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/05/2016. (rhm)
July 22, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court FORMAL ORDER from the Arkansas Supreme Court denying Appellee's Motion to Reconsider. (ljb)
April 25, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION ORDER certifying to the Supreme Court of Arkansas a question of law that may be determinative of this case. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward this Certification Order to the Supreme Court of Arkansas under his official seal. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2016. (ljb)
December 11, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/11/2015. (ks)
December 7, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Unimin Corporation's 12 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/7/2015. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. Unimin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Roberts
Represented By: Benjamin R. Askew
Represented By: Kevin M. Carnie, Jr.
Represented By: John G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McShane
Represented By: Benjamin R. Askew
Represented By: Kevin M. Carnie, Jr.
Represented By: John G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?