Edgin v. Correct Care Services et al

Plaintiff: Fred Edgin
Defendant: Correct Care Services, Heeryman, Shah and Does
Case Number: 1:2015cv00114
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 98 Report and Recommendations in their entirety. Defendant Shah's 90 Motion to Dismiss is granted, and the case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/13/2017. (mcz)
October 20, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in its entirety the 88 partial recommended disposition; and dismissing without prejudice Edgin's claims against the Doe defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/20/2017. (ljb)
May 9, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 81 the partial recommended disposition; granting 74 defendants Michelle Arnold and Regina Lynch's motion to dismiss; and denying as moot 72 the motion to dismiss for insufficient service of process. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/9/2017. (kdr)
February 21, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 68 partial recommended disposition; granting the 59 motion for summary judgment; and dismissing Plaintiff Fred Edgin's claims against Amanda Davis and Linda Hunt without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 02/21/2017. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgin v. Correct Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Edgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heeryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?