Powell, et al v. Walgreen Co, et al

Plaintiff: Elaine Powell and Larry Powell
Defendant: Walgreen Co and Doug Cutsinger
Case Number: 1:2016cv00004
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The second amended complaint, 4 , is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/22/2016. (jak)
February 10, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has received the attached letter and construes it as a motion for clarification. Motion granted. The Court's Order, 14 , does not make dismissal a certainty. If any party seeks relief - any relief, not just dismissal - from the Court before 24 February 2016, then the case will stay alive. The Court appreciates counsel's letters. To keep all communications of record, please send any future letter or paper to the Clerk for filing on the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/10/2016. (jak)
February 3, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Powells have informally told the Court that they have settled. Congratulations. The Initial Scheduling Order, 12 , and the Court's housekeeping Order, 13 , are suspended. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice unless some party seeks relief before 24 February 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/3/2016. (jak)
January 28, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Powell's to file a stand-alone third amended complaint by 12 February 2016. Walgreens and Cutsinger must file stand-alone answers - or a shared answer if they wish - by 26 February 2016. All the new pleadings should cover only already pleaded ground. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/28/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell, et al v. Walgreen Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Powell
Represented By: Timothy F. Watson, Sr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Powell
Represented By: Timothy F. Watson, Sr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey Loel Singleton(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Cutsinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Loel Singleton(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?