Buck v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Larry L Buck
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Robert Bernard Reichard and Melvin Nance
Case Number: 1:2016cv00026
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 91 the partial recommended disposition; granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff Larry Buck's § 1983 inadequate medical care claim against defendant Robert Reichard, and dismissing with prejudice Buck's medical malpractice claim under state law against Reichard; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/23/2017. (kdr)
August 18, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 40 the partial recommended disposition; and granting 22 defendant Wendy Kelley's motion to dismiss. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/18/2016. (kdr)
June 21, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 the partial recommended disposition; denying 14 Larry L. Buck's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/21/2016. (kdr)
May 23, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 the partial recommended disposition; dismissing, without prejudice, Buck's official capacity § 1983 claims against defendants Reichard, Nance, Shock, and Kelley; dismissing, with prejudice, Buck's state medical malpractice claim against Kelley; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/23/2016. (kdr)
April 1, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS directing the Clerk to send plaintiff a prisoner calculation sheet. Plaintiff must have that form completed by an authorized prison official and return it to the Clerk within thirty days of the entry of this Order. If plaintiff does not do so, the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/1/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry L Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bernard Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?