Ousley v. Jarrett et al

Plaintiff: Whitley Ousley
Defendant: Donna Jarrett, Chris Johnson, Arkansas, State of and Does
Case Number: 1:2016cv00059
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Ousley's 2 complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 07/29/2016. (rhm)
July 18, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Partial Recommendation. Ousley's motion, 9 , denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2016. (jak)
June 29, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as supplemented 4 the unopposed partial recommendation. Ousley doesn't seek injunctive relief against the state. Arkansas is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2016. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ousley v. Jarrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitley Ousley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Jarrett
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Johnson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?