Natt v. Ford et al

Plaintiff: LaWayne Natt
Defendant: Calvin Ford, Michael Whatley, Furr, M Morris, Maurice Culclager, Cantrell, Bradley, Arrika Neal, Hill, Howard and Celena Spears
Case Number: 1:2016cv00107
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 81 plaintiff's motion to dismiss this action. This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/27/2017. (ljb)
March 2, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 74 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting Defendant Neal's 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Defendant Neal without prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/2/2017. (ljb)
November 14, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the defendants' 30 motion for summary judgment. Summary judgment is granted in favor of the defendants on LaWayne Natt's claims of deliberate indifference, failure to protect, and con spiracy. On Natt's excessive force claim, summary judgment is granted to all defendants except Jerry Howard. This action is again referred to United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe for disposition or recommended disposition, as appropriate, on all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/2016. (ljb)
September 19, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 13 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Defendant Bradley; denying Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/19/2016. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natt v. Ford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaWayne Natt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Culclager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrika Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celena Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?