Schuldheisz v. Counts et al
Plaintiff: Vern Schuldheisz
Defendant: Mark Counts, Stanley Hanney, Kendra Roberts, Connie Hubbard and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2017cv00025
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Batesville Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 87 Order, this case is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/26/2018. (cmn)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting in its entirety 41 the partial recommended disposition; and dismissing without prejudice Schuldheiszs claims against defendant Doe. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/20/2017. (kdr)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting 5 the partial recommended disposition; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff Vern Schuldheisz's official capacity claims against defendants Mark Counts and Stanley Haney; and dismissing with prejudice Schuldheisz's official capacity claims against defendants Kendra Robert and Connie Hubbard. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/12/2017. (kdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuldheisz v. Counts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vern Schuldheisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Counts
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Hanney
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?