Scheurich v. Garriott

Plaintiff: David E Scheurich
Defendant: L Garriott
Case Number: 1:2017cv00054
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Scheurich's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2017. (jak)
October 19, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 16 Motion for copies. The Court directs the Clerk to send Scheurich a copy of the docket sheet and another copy of the 10/11/2017 Recommendation. The Court extends the deadline for objections to 11/3/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/19/2017. (jak)
August 3, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Scheurich's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/3/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheurich v. Garriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E Scheurich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Garriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?