Braxton v. Jackson County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Termaine Lejuane Braxton
Defendant: Jackson County Detention Center, David Lucas and Nicole Carter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 02/20/2019. (lmc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Termaine Lejuane Braxton re #4 Order, IFP Application with calculation sheet. (fjg)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Jackson County Detention Center. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/15/2019. (kdr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (additional page included in image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Termaine Lejuane Braxton. (llg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Termaine Lejuane Braxton. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braxton v. Jackson County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Termaine Lejuane Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?