Smith v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Smith
Defendant: Aric Simmons, Loman Johnson and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00008
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Kristine G Baker
1 Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice #2 . The Court certify, pursuant to U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting this recommendation and the accompany judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/8/2019. (lej)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's IFP Application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) #1 . Plaintiff must submit to the Clerk the statutory filing fee of $400, in full, within 21 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/15/2019. (lej)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Smith.(kdr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey Smith. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aric Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loman Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?