Varner v. Willams et al

Plaintiff: Bradley Varner
Defendant: Wilson, Willams, M Brewer and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting #6 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety; and dismissing without prejudice Defendant Kelley. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/12/2019. (ljb)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #6 Proposed Recommendation Statement of Necessity by Bradley Varner. (llg)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to M Brewer, Willams and Wilson. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendants Warden Williams and Mental Health Counselors M. Brewer and Wilson; and directing the USMS to serve a copy of #5 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendants, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/21/2019. (kdr)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 and #5 Defendant Kelley be DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 02/21/2019. (lmc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bradley Varner. (ljb)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the North Central Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/15/2019. (kdr)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/15/2019. (lmc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bradley Varner. (llg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley Varner. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varner v. Willams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?