Lexington Insurance Company v. WireCo Worldgroup Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Defendant: Jaco Construction Company, WireCo Worldgroup Inc, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC, John Does, Heavy Machines Inc, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc and Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH
Case Number: 1:2019cv00016
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage and correct the description of the document filed as follows, "ANSWER to #5 Crossclaims of Heavy Machines, Inc. with Jury Demand by WireCo Worldgroup Inc."(cmn)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 ADDENDUM filed by WireCo Worldgroup Inc to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,. Supplemental Exhibit (Munson, Bruce)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by WireCo Worldgroup Inc (Munson, Bruce)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Crossclaims of Heavy Machines, Inc. with Jury Demand by WireCo Worldgroup Inc.(Munson, Bruce) (Docket entry modified on 4/15/2019 to establish linkage and correct the description of the document.)(cmn)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against John Does, Heavy Machines Inc, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC by WireCo Worldgroup Inc.(Munson, Bruce)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Answer to Complaint CrossClaim of Yarbrough Cable Services LLC by Jaco Construction Company (Emerson, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yarbrough Cable Services LLC.(Watts, Richard)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Quinten J. Whiteside on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Whiteside, Quinten)
April 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Crossclaim is filed against WireCo Worldgroup Inc, Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc and John Does. (thd)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Heavy Machines, Inc. and all Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed by all Defendants by Jaco Construction Company.(Emerson, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM and Answers to All Cross-Claims against WireCo Worldgroup Inc, Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH, Yarbrough Cable Services LLC, Jaco Construction Company, Morgan Engineering Systems Inc and John Does filed by Heavy Machines Inc.(Dodson, Robert) (Docket text modified on 4/8/2019 to indicate the Crossclaim is filed against Defendants.) (thd).
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Dodson on behalf of Heavy Machines Inc (Dodson, Robert)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jaco Construction Company.(Emerson, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Emerson on behalf of Jaco Construction Company (Emerson, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT070894. summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company v. WireCo Worldgroup Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaco Construction Company
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WireCo Worldgroup Inc
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarbrough Cable Services LLC
Represented By: Richard N. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy Machines Inc
Represented By: Robert E. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Engineering Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Represented By: Quinten J. Whiteside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?