Bad Boy Inc v. Intimidator Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bad Boy Inc
Defendant: RF Products Inc and Intimidator Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00017
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Bad Boy Inc by Intimidator Inc, RF Products Inc.(Trammell, Bradley)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #14 , granted. Adam S. Baldridge is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/2019. (slb)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Adam S. Baldridge. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3429932. Filed by Intimidator Inc, RF Products Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Adam S. Baldridge)(Trammell, Bradley)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley E. Trammell on behalf of Intimidator Inc, RF Products Inc (Trammell, Bradley)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry Lee Wilson on behalf of All Defendants (Wilson, Perry)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #10 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case to Judge Marshall and issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/15/2019. (ljb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case by Bad Boy Inc; Case Number 1:17cv00070 (Campbell, Phil)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Intimidator Inc answer due 4/15/2019; RF Products Inc answer due 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/26/19. (amr)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants (Castleberry, Kenneth)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred F. Tom Thompson, III on behalf of All Defendants (Thompson, Alfred)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth P. Castleberry on behalf of All Defendants (Castleberry, Kenneth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on 2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr.. (jak)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER OF RECUSAL. I recuse from this case because of my upcoming out-of-state trial schedule. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/21/19. (mmb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Bad Boy Inc. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070937.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bad Boy Inc v. Intimidator Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RF Products Inc
Represented By: Alfred F. Tom Thompson, III
Represented By: Kenneth P. Castleberry
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Represented By: Bradley E. Trammell
Represented By: Perry Lee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intimidator Inc
Represented By: Alfred F. Tom Thompson, III
Represented By: Kenneth P. Castleberry
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Represented By: Bradley E. Trammell
Represented By: Perry Lee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bad Boy Inc
Represented By: J. Blake Hendrix
Represented By: Eric Reif Gribble
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: Haley Heath Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?